+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 4, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0844)
On March 26, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 844 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2738ER)
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 4-N)
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (14-Y 1-N)
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to L. G. sub-committee: Charters #1
On February 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 26-N)
- Passed House (69-Y 26-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2738H1
- VOTE: REJECTED (35-Y 61-N)
- Amendment by Del. Jones, D. C. rejected (35-Y 61-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 053329388-H1
- Read second time
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 053329388-H1
- Reported from C. C. T. with sub (16-Y 6-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed 053290388
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 4-N)
February 21, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2005: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 1-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: REJECTED (35-Y 61-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 26-N)
February 4, 2005: Reported from C. C. T. with sub (16-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor