+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Ed. & Health (8-Y 6-N 1-A)
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 24-N)
- Read third time and passed House (76-Y 24-N)
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 033969936-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 28, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendments (14-Y 8-N)
On January 16, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 033969936
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 6, 2003: Passed by indefinitely in Ed. & Health (8-Y 6-N 1-A)
January 30, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 24-N)
January 27, 2003: Reported from Education with amendments (14-Y 8-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor