+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0330)
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 330 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2735ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (35-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 47-N)
- Read third time and passed House (51-Y 47-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2735H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 071672299-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 071672299-H1
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #1 (Marshall. R.G.)
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 071704299
+ − Votes (7)
February 16, 2007: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2007: VOTE: (35-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2007: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 47-N)
February 2, 2007: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor