+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0666)
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 666 (effective 7/1/07)
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2732ER)
- Enrolled
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 074295116-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2732E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 074295116