+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (48-Y 51-N 1-A)
- Engrossment refused by House (48-Y 51-Y)
- Pending question ordered
- VOTE: RECONSIDERATION (50-Y 50-N)
- Motion to reconsider Committee Sub. rejected (50-Y 50-N)
- Substitute by Mr. Tate withdrawn
- Substitute by Mr. Rust ruled not germane
- Committee substitute rejected 990471466-H1
- Read second time
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 1999 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 990471466-H1
- Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (23-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to C. I. B. sub-committee: 3
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented & ordered printed 994698753
+ − Votes (3)
February 5, 1999: VOTE: RECONSIDERATION (50-Y 50-N)
February 5, 1999: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (48-Y 51-N 1-A)
February 1, 1999: Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor