+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0881)
- Enacted, Chapter 881 (effective-see bill)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (96-Y 0-N)
On April 12, 1994 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 31, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 29, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 22, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB273ER)
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 5-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (91-Y 5-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD5572176 (HB273S1)
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 3-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed LD0237176 (HB273H1)
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 18, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 5-N)
March 8, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
March 7, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N)
February 14, 1994: Reported from C. J. with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (86)
Type:
Primary Sponsor