+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Stricken from House calendar
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 999278312-H1
- Reported from Ches. & Its Trib. w/sub. (13-Y 5-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Chesapeake and Its Tributaries
- Presented & ordered printed 999235312
+ − Vote
February 5, 1999: Reported from Ches. & Its Trib. w/sub. (13-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor