+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0859)
On March 22, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 859 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2726ER)
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 039103408-S1
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 039103408-S1
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (85-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 039103408-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 032043976-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 032043976-H1
- Read second time
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 032043976-H1
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with sub (22-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 036100976
+ − Votes (6)
February 12, 2003: VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2003: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2003: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2003: Reported from Finance with sub (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor