+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0129)
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 129 (effective 7/1/07)
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2726ER)
- Enrolled
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 074386402-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2726E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 074386402
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 12, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2007: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor