+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 10, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0811)
On March 23, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 811 (effective 1/1/07)
On March 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2723ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (35-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (19-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: #1 (Orrock)
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/10/07 071318432
+ − Votes (7)
February 16, 2007: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2007: VOTE: (35-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2007: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2007: Reported from Finance (19-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor