+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Stricken from House calendar
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendments (20-Y 1-N)
On January 22, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 2
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 971695188
+ − Vote
January 31, 1997: Reported from Education with amendments (20-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor