+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0997)
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2720ER2)
- House concurred in Gov's rec. BLOCK VOICE VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 997 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 24, 2003 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2720ER)
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 1-N)
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/amds (14-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 039337783-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/amds (22-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 039337783
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (8)
April 2, 2003: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2003: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
February 11, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2003: Reported from Transportation w/amds (14-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2003: Reported from Tra. w/amds (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor