+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 20, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0510)
On March 18, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 510 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 8, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 3, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2720ER)
On February 14, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/amds. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 4-N)
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 970364364-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 30, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/amds. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 970364364