+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (67)
On May 7, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0746)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 746 (effective 4/16/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB272ER)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rec. of conf. report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (72-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (72-Y 2-N)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- Passed by temporarily
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (29-Y 0-N 8-A)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (29-Y 0-N 8-A)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute accepted by conference committee
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause added
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (25-Y 0-N 11-A)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (25-Y 0-N 11-A)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Hawkins, Marye, Howell
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Murphy, Puller, Wilkins
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST R (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Reconsidered insisting on substitute (35-Y 0-N 3-A)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (35-Y 0-N 3-A)
- Senate insisted on substitute (35-Y 0-N 3-A)
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST R (35-Y 0-N 3-A)
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House (4-Y 84-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (4-Y 84-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Sen. Chichester agreed to 985453376-S1
- Floor substitute printed 985453376-S1 (Chichester)
- Engrossed by Senate - fl. sub. 985453376-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (35-Y 0-N 3-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (35-Y 0-N 3-A)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N 1-A)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (37-Y 1-N 1-A)
- Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 0-N 3-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (36-Y 0-N 3-A)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 988848376-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 988848376-H1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 988848376-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (29-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 989103376
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (16)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (25-Y 0-N 11-A)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (72-Y 2-N)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (29-Y 0-N 8-A)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST R (35-Y 0-N 3-A)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (35-Y 0-N 3-A)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST R (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (4-Y 84-N)
February 27, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (37-Y 1-N 1-A)
February 27, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (35-Y 0-N 3-A)
February 27, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (36-Y 0-N 3-A)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (29-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor