+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 8, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0757)
On March 28, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 757 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1999 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2711ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Senate amds agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment rejected
- Amendment by Sen. Newman agreed to
- Amendment by Sen. Woods agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
On February 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsider constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (13-Y 2-N)
On February 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 1-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 992752410-E
- Amendment by Mrs. Puller agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment (23-Y 1-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 992752410
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (9)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1999: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (13-Y 2-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
February 5, 1999: Reported from Education with amendment (23-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor