+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 12, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0271)
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 271 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB270ER)
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (36-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On January 27, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/04 045420428
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 25, 2004: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2004: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (36-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 19, 2004: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2004: Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor