+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 20, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0336)
On March 19, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 336 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2001 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2693ER)
On February 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 3-N)
On February 3, 2001 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 011162724-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 011162724-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2001 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 011162724-H1
On January 31, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with sub (25-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 2
On January 17, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 011014986
+ − Votes (7)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2001: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
January 31, 2001: Reported from General Laws with sub (25-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor