+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 20, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0508)
On March 18, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 508 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 1997 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 25, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2693ER)
On February 19, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate amendment agreed to by House
On February 18, 1997 in the House:
- Senate amendment rejected by House (2-Y 97-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (2-Y 97-N)
On February 17, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 971012114-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 971012114-H1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 971012114-H1
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 973575114