+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0415)
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 415 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2690ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Motion to reconsider Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 074706129
+ − Votes (8)
February 21, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2007: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2007: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor