+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 17, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0265)
On March 11, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 265 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 1997 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 24, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2690ER)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 4-N)
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 973812114