+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 18, 2001 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day in C. J. (10-Y 5-N)
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 012369636-H1
- Passed by temporarily
- Committee substitute agreed to 012369636-H1
On February 3, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 012369636-H1
- Reported from M. & P. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to M. & P. sub-committee: 2
On January 17, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented & ordered printed 014301636
+ − Votes (4)
February 18, 2001: Passed by for the day in C. J. (10-Y 5-N)
February 5, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2001: Reported from M. & P. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor