+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On March 28, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0325)
On March 20, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 325 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2686ER)
On February 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (40-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (89-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Watkins, Hawkins, Lambert
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Delegates: Pollard, Lingamfelter, Welch
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House (1-Y 97-N)
On February 21, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2686S1
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 054689468-S1
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 054689468-S1
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2686H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 053120468-H1
- Read second time
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 053120468-H1
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with sub (22-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: #2
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 053058428