+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 24, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0192)
On March 20, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 192 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2005 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2681ER)
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 054159380
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2005: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2005: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor