+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Transport. (6-Y 9-N)
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 38-N)
- Read third time and passed House (57-Y 38-N)
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2677H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 053590300-H1
- Read second time
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 053590300-H1
- Reported from Tra. w/sub (17-Y 3-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 056624300
+ − Votes (3)
February 17, 2005: Failed to report (defeated) in Transport. (6-Y 9-N)
February 7, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 38-N)
February 3, 2005: Reported from Tra. w/sub (17-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor