+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0162)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 162 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2674ER)
- Enrolled
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed 19104308D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 11, 2019: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2019: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2019: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2019: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor