+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (63)
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0876)
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2671ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 876 (effective 7/1/07)
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2007 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2671ER)
On February 24, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 0-N)
- Emergency clause deleted by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (85-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (36-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
On February 24, 2007 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 070594308-H2
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute rejected by House (5-Y 91-N)
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (30-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on substitute (30-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 91-N)
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Griffith, Sherwood, Marsden
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Howell, Stolle, Norment
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 2-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 2-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2671S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 077858820-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 077858820-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
- Motion to reconsider Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2671H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 077847308-H1
- Emergency clause added
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 077847308-H1
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 077786105
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (12)
April 4, 2007: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
April 4, 2007: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2007: VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2007: VOTE: (36-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2007: VOTE: (30-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2007: VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 91-N)
February 21, 2007: VOTE: (38-Y 2-N)
February 20, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor