+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 19, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0285)
On March 15, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 285 (effective 7/1/01)
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2670ER)
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Sen. Whipple rejected
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Sen. Houck rejected
- Passed Senate (26-Y 12-N 2-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (26-Y 12-N 2-A)
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
- Reconsider motion to pass by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (10-Y 4-N 1-A)
On February 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (69-Y 29-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 29-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 019169972-H1 (64-Y 33-N)
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (64-Y 33-N)
- Motion to rerefer to committee rejected
- Read second time
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (45-Y 47-N)
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 019169972-H1
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (63-Y 33-N)
- Engrossment refused by House (45-Y 47-N)
- Engrossment reconsidered by House (63-Y 33-N)
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2001 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 019169972-H1
- Reported from Tra. w/sub (21-Y 3-N)
On January 15, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 014639972
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
February 20, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (26-Y 12-N 2-A)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2001: Reported from Transportation (10-Y 4-N 1-A)
February 6, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 29-N)
February 5, 2001: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (64-Y 33-N)
February 4, 2001: VOTE: RECONSIDER (63-Y 33-N)
February 4, 2001: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (45-Y 47-N)
February 1, 2001: Reported from Tra. w/sub (21-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor