+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed by in Courts of Justice with letter (15-Y 0-N)
- Subject matter referred to Commission on Mental Health Law Reform pursuant to Senate Rule 20 (L)
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Special on Proposed Mental Health Legislation
On February 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 081472404-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB267H1
On February 9, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (24-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources (Hamilton)
On January 28, 2008 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 081472404-H1
On January 25, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health
On January 2, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087834404
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2008: Passed by in Courts of Justice with letter (15-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2008: Reported from Appropriations (24-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2008: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor