+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 29, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0426)
On March 21, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 426 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2669ER)
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Senate amendment rejected by House (2-Y 95-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 95-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate amendment agreed to by House
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (96-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd (13-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2669H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 055510404-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 055510404-H1
On January 31, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 057998404
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 24, 2005: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 95-N)
February 24, 2005: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (96-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2005: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2005: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd (13-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2005: Reported from C. J. with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor