+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 26, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0220)
On March 17, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 220 (effective 7/1/99)
On February 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2668ER)
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 991716256-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture w/amendment (24-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 991716256