+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 19, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0408)
On March 15, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 408 (effective 7/1/97)
On February 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 14, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2666ER)
On February 12, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 7, 1997 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 2-N)
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 973438843-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 2
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 973438843
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 12, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1997: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 24, 1997: Reported from Education with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor