+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 31, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0562)
On March 22, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 562 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2666ER)
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (95-Y 1-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2666S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 052783404-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 052783404-S1
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/sub (13-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2666H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 053574404-H1
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 053574404-H1
On February 1, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/sub (21-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: Subcommittee # 2
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 053460404