+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left in Rules
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 8, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance
On January 23, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 099878520
+ − Votes (4)
February 10, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2009: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor