+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 31, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0597)
On March 22, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 597 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2654ER)
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2654H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 055509340-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 055509340-H1
On January 31, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (19-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 056081340
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2005: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2005: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2005: Reported from C. J. with substitute (19-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor