+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0745)
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 745 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2653ER)
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd (14-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 034455604