+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0149)
On March 16, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 149 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2649ER)
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 6-N)
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 6-N)
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 13, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 030366674
+ − Votes (5)
February 12, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2003: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 6-N)
January 31, 2003: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor