+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 18, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0290)
On March 12, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 290 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 1997 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 24, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2647ER)
On February 14, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 979160443-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 979160443-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from C. & L. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 979160443-S1
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 4-N)
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 1-N)
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 970562443-E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
On January 30, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (20-Y 2-N)
On January 21, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 970562443
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 14, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1997: Reported from C. & L. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
January 29, 1997: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (20-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor