+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0122)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 122 (effective 7/1/14)
On February 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB264ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: # 2
On December 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102751D
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2014: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2014: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2014: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor