+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0753)
- Enacted, Chapter 753 (effective 4/27/22)
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB264ER2)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB264ER)
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB264H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22104857D-H1
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 22104857D-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103993D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
April 27, 2022: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 27, 2022: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2022: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2022: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2022: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor