+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0666)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 666 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2639ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 1-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2639H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105004D-H1
- Read second time
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19105004D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented and ordered printed 19103480D