+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 27, 2009 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0223)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 223 (effective 7/1/09)
On February 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2639ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 098703584-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2639E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: FOIA
On January 23, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed 098703584
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 2009: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2009: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2009: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor