+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 1, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0438)
On March 25, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 438 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 5, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 1999 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 1, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2638ER)
On February 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (25-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 2
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 993472818