+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 31, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0561)
On March 22, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 561 (effective 7/1/05)
On February 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2635ER)
On February 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: #2
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 056689300
+ − Votes (5)
February 10, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2005: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor