+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 20, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0385)
On March 19, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 385 (effective 7/01/01)
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2631ER)
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 019716872-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 019716872-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 019716872-H1
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 019561872
+ − Votes (8)
February 20, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2001: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2001: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2001: Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor