+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Passed by temporarily
- Motion to refer to Appropriations committee rejected (48-Y 50-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (48-Y 50-N)
- Engrossment refused by House (2-Y 95-N)
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT REFUSED (2-Y 95-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Rules without Recommendation (14-Y 0-N)
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100120D
- Referred to Committee on Rules