+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0623)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 623 (effective 7/1/22)
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB263ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 22100187D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB263E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Energy with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100187D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 3, 2022: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2022: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2022: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2022: Reported from Commerce and Energy with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor