+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004)
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 4 (effective 7/1/05)
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 15, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 14, 2005 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2629ER)
On February 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 6-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (89-Y 6-N 1-A)
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2629H1
- Pending question ordered
- Committee substitute agreed to 055496204-H1
- Read second time
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 055496204-H1
On January 24, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (19-Y 2-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 051665216
+ − Votes (5)
February 11, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2005: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 6-N 1-A)
January 24, 2005: Reported from C. J. with substitute (19-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor