+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 31, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0594)
On March 22, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 594 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2627ER)
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 1-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2627H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 058008204-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 058008204-H1
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (19-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 057929404
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 2005: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N)
February 22, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2005: Reported from Rules with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2005: Reported from C. J. with substitute (19-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor