+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 1, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0437)
On March 25, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 437 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 4, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2625ER)
On February 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsider constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N)
On February 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 999125322-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 999125322-H1
- Read second time
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Education with substitute (24-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 999125322-H1
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 993480322