+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0743)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 743 (effective 7/1/19)
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2621ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (94-Y 3-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendment (11-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2621H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106249D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19106249D-H1
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented and ordered printed 19104060D
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (7)
February 19, 2019: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N)
February 15, 2019: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2019: Reported from Local Government with amendment (11-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2019: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor